OPEN HEAVEN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
On 1 September 2011 the activites of Charity 1072832 were transferred. The Charities objects are "The proclamation and furtherance of the Christian Gospel and the preaching and teaching of the word of God in accordance with the essential Doctrine and Articles of belief of the Pioneer Network of Churches."
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 02 November 2010: Standard registration
- 18 April 2019: Funds received from 1072832 OPEN HEAVEN
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Ford | Chair | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Prof Sheryl Rose Williams | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ANDREW CRANEFIELD | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Winston Gehan Rasaiah | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ann Halse | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dean Howard | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £394.82k | £320.74k | £300.93k | £408.09k | £396.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £386.01k | £259.43k | £299.21k | £343.27k | £383.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.31k | £1.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3.1.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOAD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES- OF, ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3.1.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 3.2 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHURCH IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
OPEN HEAVEN CHURCH
St Peters Centre
Storer Road
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE11 5EQ
- Phone:
- 01509215036
- Email:
- trustees@openheaven.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window