METHODIST GIRLS' HIGH SCHOOL OLD GIRLS' ASSOCIATION (UK BRANCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education of present pupils in MGHS Sierra Leone by providing teaching aids, recreational eqiupmwnt,award of scholarships etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Blanshard | Chair | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Olympia Sidrattu Dumbuya | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Joyce Patricia Kargbo | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Victoria Gowdie | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Daphne Jones | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Irene Girlie Patricia Savage | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Hilda Shyllon | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Valerie V Cole | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.65k | £7.27k | £7.71k | £38.79k | £39.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.78k | £13.61k | £7.66k | £44.98k | £26.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 APRIL 2010 as amended on 21 Nov 2020 as amended on 21 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
To advance the education of the pupils at the Methodist Girls’ High School, Freetown, Sierra Leone, West Africa by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities, scholarships and maintenance allowances (not provided by the local education authority) in such ways as the charity trustees think fit.
Area of benefit
SIERRA LEONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Limes Walk
Linden Grove
LONDON
SE15 3LJ
- Phone:
- 07944029197
- Email:
- mghsogauk1880@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window