LEARNING TOGETHER CHESHIRE AND WARRINGTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the voluntary sector for the benefit of the public in Cheshire and Warrington and surrounding areas, in particular but not exclusively by providing a forum for third sector involved in education and learning; developing a partnership approach and facilitating dialogue ; improving learning for volunteers and employees; supporting learning providers to meet stakeholder requirements
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Warrington
Governance
- 19 October 2010: Standard registration
- 19 November 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 07 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 11 October 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED WITH COMPANIES HOUSE ON 1 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1 THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN CHESHIRE AND WARRINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY A PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS INVOLVED IN EDUCATION AND LEARNING TO ENCOURAGE COMMUNICATION, NETWORKING, INFORMATION SHARING AND REPRESENTATION B DEVELOPING A PARTNERSHIP APPROACH TO ENCOURAGE COLLABORATION BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS ON ISSUES OF LEARNING AND SKILLS DEVELOPMENT C FACILITATING DIALOGUE BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS INTERESTED IN ISSUES OF LEARNING AND SKILLS DEVELOPMENT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING RELATIONS AND COMMUNICATION D IMPROVING ACCESS TO LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES FOR USERS, VOLUNTEERS AND EMPLOYEES OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS E SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF THIRD SECTOR LEARNING PROVIDERS TO MEET QUALITY THRESHOLDS AND STAKEHOLDER REQUIREMENTS AND DEVELOPING A PARTNERSHIP APPROACH TO THE DELIVERY AND DEVELOPMENT OF LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES AND GOOD PRACTICE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THE CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. 2 TO CARRY OUT ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
CHESHIRE AND WARRINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window