Trustees STREATLEY HILL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1137119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jade Van Der Merwe Trustee 28 February 2025
None on record
Eleanor Coyle Trustee 02 December 2024
None on record
Alexandra Boutouili Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Matthew Whittle Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Nicola McNeill Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Plowman Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Dirk Atkinson Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record