Accounts and annual returns SUNBEAMS PRE-SCHOOL (RADFORD SEMELE)

Charity number: 1137023
Charity reporting is up to date (64 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 03 August 2024 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 03 August 2024 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 July 2023 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 19 July 2023 49 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 25 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 16 June 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 16 June 2021 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 October 2020 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 October 2020 125 days late Download Open in new window