SUNBEAMS PRE-SCHOOL (RADFORD SEMELE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At Sunbeams, we feel, provide a happy atmosphere where children feel secure and cared for. We aim to present learning opportunities in stimulating, diverse and fun ways so that children leave us feeling confident and well-prepared for school. These activities are provided during free play and through small and large group activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £6,665 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 22 July 2010: Standard registration
- 06 June 2011: Funds received from 1093257 SUNBEAMS RADFORD SEMELE
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leire Benedicto-Alonso | Chair | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Louise Goode | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Williams | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sacha Daniel White | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Emma Edmonds | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Louise White | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Clare Gregory | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roseanne Marjorie Edwards | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Vaughan Williams | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.19k | £100.09k | £125.13k | £105.52k | £101.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.24k | £102.69k | £116.84k | £112.44k | £120.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £64.73k | £81.91k | £105.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.00k | £2.00k | £11.00k | £6.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 June 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 16 June 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 October 2020 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 03 October 2020 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/05/2010
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: 1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY 2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS 3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sunbeams Preschool
School Lane
Radford Semele
LEAMINGTON SPA
Warwickshire
CV31 1TQ
- Phone:
- 01926 470978
- Email:
- sunbeamshb@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window