TRINITY CHURCH ISLINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church?s objects are the advancement of the Christian Faith by the faithful teaching of the Scriptures at Trinity Church Islington and by the recruitment, education, training and sending of gospel ministers and others around the United Kingdom and abroad to establish and renew Christian churches and ministries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Islington
Governance
- 09 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nigel Beynon | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yueng Tchern Lenn | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Gentle | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID MOODY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.48k | £222.54k | £239.55k | £246.78k | £249.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.85k | £237.81k | £228.58k | £240.33k | £270.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING: 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRIST'S KINGDOM BY THE FAITHFUL TEACHING OF THE SCRIPTURES AT TRINITY CHURCH ISLINGTON AND BY THE RECRUITMENT EDUCATION TRAINING AND SENDING OF GOSPEL MINISTERS AND OTHERS AROUND THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD TO ESTABLISH AND RENEW CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND MINISTRIES RELATED THERETO 2 THE RELIEF OF NEED HARDSHIP PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS AMONG ANY PERSONS IN THE SCOPE OF THE CHURCH'S WORK 3 THE SUPPORT OF CHRISTIANS WHO ARE PERSECUTED BY REASON OF THEIR FAITH PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT SUCH SUPPORT SHALL BE NON-POLITICAL IN NATURE 4 THE SUPPORT OF CHRISTIANS WHO ARE ENGAGED FULL-TIME IN THE MISSIONARY WORK OF PROCLAIMING THE GOSPEL AND IN BRINGING OTHERS TO BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST AND TO LIVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH HIS TEACHING
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Marks Church
Myddleton Square
London
EC1R 1XX
- Phone:
- 07855 976990
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window