Accounts and annual returns MICHAEL BLAKE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139340
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 May 2019 03 April 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 10 May 2018 15 August 2019 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 10 May 2017 08 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 10 May 2016 28 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 May 2016 Not Required