Financial history MICHAEL BLAKE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139340
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/05/2015 10/05/2016 10/05/2017 10/05/2018 10/05/2019
Total gross income £4.08k £4.55k £103 £965 £310
Total expenditure £6.43k £7.15k £520 £405 £470
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A