Financial history EVANGELICAL CHURCH OF NEW JERUSALEM

Charity number: 1140374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £65.27k £21.99k £27.12k £27.20k £19.32k
Total expenditure £64.22k £20.79k £25.23k £15.93k £9.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A