Accounts and annual returns SHINING LIGHT

Charity Number: 1138206
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 09 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2015 15 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2014 14 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2013 07 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2013 Not Required