LIVERPOOL DOG AND ANIMAL RESCUE 1990 LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescuing and re-homing abused, abandoned, stray dogs and rehabilitating them so that they can be homed. We take in those dogs that have been both emotionally and physically abused. We work in conjunction with a dog behaviourist and we work hard and carry out rigorous home checks to ensure all the dogs in our care go to lovely, forever homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 17 May 2011: Standard registration
- ANIMAL AID 1990 LIMITED (Previous name)
- LIVERPOOL DOG RESCUE 1990 LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Rhodes | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
LISA RHODES | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.59k | £79.05k | £49.33k | £33.11k | £36.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.92k | £45.20k | £52.65k | £47.86k | £38.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2023 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2023 | 361 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/05/2011 as amended on 03 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ANIMAL WELFARE AND PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF CARING FOR DOGS WITH AN AIM TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF ANIMAL WELFARE, AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF BENEFIT TO AND PROVIDE SUPPORT, TRAINING AND ADVICE WHICH ENHANCES THE EFFECTIVENESS OF ORGANIZATIONS INVOLVING VOLUNTEERS TO PROMOTE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE WELL BEING OF DOGS IN THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND. TO BENEFIT THE PUBLIC IN THE RELIEF OF THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY, IN PARTICULAR, PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 COUNTY ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L4 3QF
- Phone:
- 07455179155
- Email:
- ldrtrustee@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window