Trustees FAITHS4CHANGE
Charity Number: 1138834

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liz Atherton | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Richard Watchorn | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Piara Miah | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Lucy Atkinson | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Eaton | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
LAIRD RYAN | Trustee | 15 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP SIMON LEIGH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.