THE HAVEN COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a small community centre in Welsh House Farm, Quinton, Birmingham. We offer after school clubs, community lunches, youth activities a play and stay and education/ mentoring/ support around returning to work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,900 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 29 October 2010: Standard registration
- LIFT COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chanel Morrison-Jolley | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ann Lowe | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jim Nicholl | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Desrie-Ann Mann-Galindo | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Payne | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Cleveland | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH SAMUE BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH JANE TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.51k | £185.71k | £81.75k | £164.01k | £200.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.18k | £171.52k | £122.83k | £122.83k | £164.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £5.40k | £9.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE OR SUPPORT ACTIVITIES WHICH ENCOURAGE THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL, EMOTIONAL, SOCIAL, MORAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO ALCOHOL, DRUG AND SOLVENT ABUSE (AND THE CONSEQUENT EFFECTS OF SUCH ABUSE) AND TO THE EFFECTS OF CRIME GENERALLY; TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT A SAFER AND INCREASED QUALITY OF LIFE THROUGH THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM CRIMINAL ACTS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AMONG THE UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND WORK EXPERIENCE; THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; AND THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE WELSH HOUSE FARM ESTATE IN BIRMINGHAM.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Rilstone Road
Birmingham
B32 2NR
- Phone:
- 01216810388
- Website:
-
havencommunityproject.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window