STANFORD IN THE VALE PRE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate as a pre-school providing educational care for 2-5 year olds following EYFS guidelines. We are OFSTED registered and are a non -profit registered charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £105,004 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 18 August 2010: Standard registration
- 28 June 2011: Funds received from 1032558 STANFORD IN THE VALE PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP ASSOCIAT...
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Woods | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Ireson | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Robson | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lewis | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathrine Amies | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nina Stillion | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.02k | £92.72k | £102.36k | £107.75k | £131.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.02k | £109.11k | £99.02k | £119.08k | £131.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £71.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.62k | £6.03k | £11.50k | £86.25k | £105.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 7 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: A OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; B ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; C INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHER THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE OXFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Recreation Ground
Huntersfield
Stanford in the Vale
Faringdon
Oxon
- Phone:
- 01367 718696
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window