Stolkin Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities are to apply income in favour of the charities objects. Applications are at the absolute discretion of the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- South Africa
Governance
- 19 October 2010: Standard registration
- MARK STOLKIN FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ROBERT STOLKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGEAUX LISA STOLKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RENATE LUBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.82k | £96.15k | £14.40k | £21.96k | £144.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £528.28k | £577.11k | £450.77k | £451.29k | £304.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2011 as amended on 02 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
A TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, DANCING AND THE PERFORMING ARTS B TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE FIELDS OF PAINTING, DRAWING, ILLUSTRATION, VISUAL ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF PHOTOGRAPHY ALSO PROVIDING OR ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF PHOTOGRAPHY OR ART FREELY ACCESSIBLE TO THE PUBLIC. C TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES D TO AWARD SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL OR CHARITABLE ESTABLISHMENT APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES TO PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE E TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING POVERTY AND ILL-HEALTH IN ALL THEIR VARIOUS FORMS AND THE CAUSES OF POVERTY AND ILL-HEALTH INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO VICTIMS OF TERRORISM AND OTHER FORMS OF TRAUMA F TO FURTHER EDUCATION GENERALLY BY THE GRANTING OR GIVING OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS OF ALL KINDS G TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH H TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION(S) OF CHRISTIANITY I TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE AND/OR ASSIST IN THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS, MONUMENTS AND SITES OF SPECIAL HISTORICAL AND/OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14-16 EGERTON GARDENS MEWS
LONDON
SW3 2EH
- Phone:
- 02075890899
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window