BETTY STOTT MEDICAL RESEARCH CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust was established for charitable purposes only and uses its investment income to support, through donations, a wide range of charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 January 2011: Standard registration
- 03 September 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 03 September 2019: Funds transferred to 1126249 MARSLAND MCADOO CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.92k | £9.15k | £7.41k | £10.20k | £7.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.65k | £9.34k | £5.76k | £5.74k | £4.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 12 March 2019 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 27 March 2018 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 03 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY REGISTERED CHARITY WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE USING MEDICAL RESEARCH FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES OR PROMOTING MEDICAL RESEARCH TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND SPECIALISTS WORKING IN A PARTICULAR MEDICAL FIELD AND PUBLISHING ANY USEFUL RESULTS ARISING FROM SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window