SIMPLE 8 THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SIMPLE8'S CHARITABLE OBJECT IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE DRAMATIC ART AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART BY PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC THEATRE APPEARANCES. SIMPLE8'S CURRENT PROJECTS INCLUDE A TOUR OF ENGLAND AND SCOTLAND OF 'MOBY-DICK' AND A NEW PRODUCTION 'LAND OF THE FREE'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 December 2010: Standard registration
- SIMPLE 8 (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sebastian Fernandez-Armesto | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND RILEY | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|||||
RICHARD DIGBY DAY | Trustee | 15 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
GENEVIEVE MARY MUINZER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.67k | £0 | £1.00k | £3.70k | £450 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.73k | £1.94k | £3.88k | £3.53k | £2.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 22 June 2020 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 7 JULY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 8 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE DRAMATIC ART AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART BY PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC THEATRE PERFORMANCES.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEATH HOUSE
LYNEHAM ROAD
MILTON-UNDER-WYCHWOOD
CHIPPING NORTON
OX7 6LW
- Phone:
- 07821875899
- Email:
- sebarmesto@gmail.com
- Website:
-
WWW.SIMPLE8.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window