HELPING HEARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supported Bangladeshi victims off the disaster, Provided blankets,hygenic washes, water tablets. The Phillipines earth quake provided blankets, medicine and shelter boxe. Provided a water tank for Kashmir school and we are still providing help for the schools in Kenya.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Bangladesh
- India
- Kenya
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 25 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FAROOQ AHMED | Trustee | 02 February 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.30k | £7.30k | £8.40k | £6.80k | £6.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.00k | £7.00k | £8.00k | £6.00k | £6.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG MEMBERS OF THE ASIAN COMMUNITY AND THE GREATER COMMUNITY RESIDING IN NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF LUNCHEON CLUBS AND GOODS AND SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. 2 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM ITEM TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 BEAUVALE ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 2EW
- Phone:
- 07811402384
- Email:
- FAROOQ1239@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window