DIVINE PROPHETIC INTERDENOMINATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We preached the gospel, win the soul and carry out religious activities inline with our agreed principal activities as stipulated in our plan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 August 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 06 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clementina Chira | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Majekodunmi | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/08/2018 | 27/08/2019 | 27/08/2020 | 27/08/2021 | 27/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £713.33k | £166.51k | £162.96k | £43.19k | £89.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £715.89k | £172.64k | £106.20k | £71.31k | £92.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £713.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £686.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £28.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £30.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days | |
Annual return | 27 August 2022 | 16 August 2024 | 416 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 August 2022 | 16 August 2024 | 416 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 August 2021 | 13 March 2024 | 625 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 August 2021 | 13 March 2024 | 625 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 August 2020 | 25 October 2021 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 August 2020 | 25 October 2021 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 August 2019 | 21 October 2021 | 481 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 August 2019 | 21 October 2021 | 481 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3.1.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3.1.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 3.2 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHURCH IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
DPIM
801 Old Kent Road
LONDON
SE15 1NX
- Phone:
- 07944961778
- Website:
-
WWW.DPIM.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window