ESSEX CRICKET FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for the playing of cricket and other sports and leisure occupations of such persons who have need for such facilities by reason of their age, infirmity or disablement. To advance the education of young people and to relieve the need, hardship or distress of persons who are living or were formerly resident in Essex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 05 October 2010: Standard registration
- 21 March 2012: Funds received from 281743 THE ESSEX COUNTY CRICKET CLUB YOUTH TRUST
- ESSEX CRICKET AND COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Elizabeth Hargreaves | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Canon Dr John Andrew Spence CBE DL | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myles Thomas Churchill | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Carol Heley | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT IAN MCLINTOCK | Trustee | 24 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ALAN GOOCH | Trustee | 24 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £237.89k | £39.63k | £274.72k | £266.11k | £93.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.98k | £105.68k | £181.19k | £121.58k | £186.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 January 2025 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 January 2025 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 January 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 January 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 February 2023 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 February 2023 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JULY 2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF ESSEX AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE TERRITORY"):- 4.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ("FACILITIES" IN THIS ARTICLE 4 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 4.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 4.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THOSE IN SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES, THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY; 4.4 TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (INCLUDING BY PROVIDING GOODS, SERVICES SUPPORT AND/OR ASSISTANCE, WHETHER FINANCIAL OR OTHERWISE) THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE LIVING IN OR WERE FORMERLY RESIDENT IN ESSEX; 4.5 FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Essex County Cricket Club
The Cloud County Ground
New Writtle Street
CHELMSFORD
ESSEX
CM2 0PG
- Phone:
- 01245 254016
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window