GURU NANAK GURDWARA CULTURAL AND RECREATIONAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Daily worship for the Sikh congregation Participation of the Sikh congregration in events held in Preston i.e.Preston Guild The Gurdwara is open 7 days a week for the Sikh congregation Langar (free meal) to be provided twice a week for the congregation Classes held for the congregation i.e. Punjabi classes, Teaching of hymns and musical instruments Daily prays conducted by Granthi (Priest)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 05 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BHAG SINGH | Chair | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
AVTAR CHAND MALHI | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jasvir Singh | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
GURMAIL SINGH | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
LAKHBIR SINGH RAI | Trustee | 09 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
AMRIK SINGH PARHAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BALDEV RAI KANDA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.56k | £45.69k | £63.22k | £53.99k | £66.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.04k | £35.35k | £112.55k | £48.31k | £49.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.50k | £4.50k | £8.83k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE FAITH IN THE TEN GURUS, THEIR TEACHINGS AND THE SHRI GURU GRANT SAHIB WITHIN THE SIKH RELIGION IN THE PRESTON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT OF LANCASHIRE, HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE "AREA OF BENEFIT". B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE SIKH COMMUNITY RESIDENT WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. C) TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A CENTRE PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR USE BY MEMBERS OF THE SIKH COMMUNITY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
PRESTON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT OF LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
GURU NANAK
GURDWARA CULTURAL
& RECREATIONAL CENTRE
2- 20 Tunbridge Street
PRESTON
PR1 5YP
- Phone:
- 01772798395
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window