COMMUNITY HOUSE (ETON ROAD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Centre Enabling members of the community to run clubs, workgroups, meetings and societies. Continuing to maintain space for worship, reflection and interfaith dialogue. Seeking feedback from partners and learning how best to respond to local needs. Providing youth work to develop capacity and reduce anti-social behaviour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newport City
Governance
- 02 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Haywood | Chair | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Priday | Trustee | 21 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katra Martine Smith | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Lesley Wilson | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Janice Jones | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Sughra Muhammed | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.22k | £188.90k | £225.71k | £234.45k | £241.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.92k | £161.41k | £122.36k | £193.47k | £249.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.69k | £5.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF MAINDEE AND THE NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES OF NEWPORT, SOUTH WALES, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND SPECIFICALLY (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (2) TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND WELLBEING (3) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS (4) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH WAYS THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
MAINDEE AND NEWPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community House Eton Road (CHER)
Community House
Eton Road
NEWPORT
Gwent
NP19 0BL
- Phone:
- 01633 265486
- Email:
- admin@etonrdch.org
- Website:
-
etonrdch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window