AOG FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Education in the UK and abroad by funding equipment, educational material, conferences & courses and infrastructure that are healthcare related in general, but dentistry in particular including specific training, grants for vocational training and community training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
- Tanzania
Governance
- 17 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Promodh Satyapal Dina Nath DATTA | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Raseshkumar Patel | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr MAHESH PATEL | Trustee | 29 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr RUBY AUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MANJUL VASANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £481 | £0 | £2.00k | £0 | £1.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45k | £1.06k | £5.83k | £11.06k | £1.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 16 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE UK AND ABROAD BY FUNDING EQUIPMENT, EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL, CONFERENCES & COURSES AND INFRASTRUCTURE THAT ARE HEALTHCARE RELATED IN GENERAL, BUT DENTISTRY IN PARTICULAR INCLUDING SPECIFIC TRAINING, GRANTS FOR VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND COMMUNITY TRAINING; 2. ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING LIVES BY SETTING UP DENTAL CLINICS AND OPERATING THEATRES AND SUPPORTING SURGICAL INTERVENTIONS, SUCH AS TREATMENT OF CLEFT LIP AND PALATE, MOBILE CLINICS FOR RELIEF OF DENTAL PAIN IN THIRD WORLD COMMUNITIES; 3) ADVANCEMENT OF COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT BY SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT,
Area of benefit
THE UK AND ABROAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 Uphill Road
LONDON
NW7 4QE
- Phone:
- 02087641424
- Email:
- maheshpateluk@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window