THORPE BAY U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(i) to advance the education of the public and in particular the education of older people no longer in full time gainful employment in Thorpe Bay and its surrounding locality. (ii) the provision of facilities for leisure time and recreational activities with the object of improving the conditions of life for the above persons in the interests of their social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 23 September 2010: Standard registration
- THORPE BAY UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Barnes | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael Walker | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hylton Thompson | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Lewis | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Sheern | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Jonas | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Cattell | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Dewey | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wright | Trustee | 18 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Sleap | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.46k | £7.42k | £41.08k | £48.64k | £52.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.85k | £4.12k | £44.28k | £45.02k | £50.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/2011 AS AMENDED ON 18/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
THORPE BAY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Rackenford
Shoeburyness
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS3 8BE
- Phone:
- 07900032828
- Email:
- hyltont@blueyonder.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window