OLDBURY BUSY BEES

Charity number: 1139068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Rural setting playgroup offering 6 sessions per week for children aged 2 years to 4 years 11 months. The catchment area is about 4 miles and takes in the town of Thornbury and surrounding villages and hamlets. Some of the children feed into the local village school. We have many aims but the main one being to have FUN.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £63,114
Total expenditure: £55,643

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 November 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Polly Pearce Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Amelia Sorrell Trustee 08 September 2017
None on record
Kate Thompson Trustee 04 September 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £36.20k £34.67k £31.56k £39.51k £63.11k
Total expenditure £26.07k £27.25k £36.42k £46.60k £55.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.27k £25.77k £23.56k £33.00k £43.12k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 July 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 03 July 2023 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 March 2021 273 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 March 2021 273 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE PAVILION
OLDBURY PLAYING FIELDS
WESTMARSH LANE
OLDBURY ON SEVERN
BRISTOL
BS35 1QD
Phone:
01454412466
Website:

No information available