Financial history THE INSTITUTION OF POWER ENGINEERS

Charity number: 1139906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £70.63k £52.99k £84.41k £98.09k £92.87k
Total expenditure £69.43k £49.93k £78.19k £93.95k £92.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.09k £4.58k N/A N/A