Trustees THE INSTITUTION OF POWER ENGINEERS
Charity number: 1139906

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Suresh Sampath | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Tottman | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
RONALD JAMES HUNT | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Barker | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Macafee | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Harrison | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Douglas Cooper | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stan Archer | Trustee | 24 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANTHONY PLATT | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.