LEICESTERSHIRE & RUTLAND 4X4 RESPONSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide transport and other logistical support to the community, working with the emergency services, councils, meals on wheels and similar entities, using 4x4 equipped vehicles and drivers during time of inclement weather or civil emergency in the Leicestershire and Rutland area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 02 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON JOHN DALE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Joshua Stephen John Chatt | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Down | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stuart Bailey | Trustee | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Mark Edwards | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.30k | £23.57k | £12.78k | £12.61k | £11.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.29k | £15.60k | £16.46k | £13.12k | £9.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING EQUIPMENT, VEHICLES AND OTHER RESOURCES TO OFFER SUPPORT IN ADVERSE CONDITIONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 PALMER AVENUE
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE11 5NH
- Phone:
- 07716 113911
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window