Financial history SOUTHERN HOLDERNESS RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 1138808
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £235.61k £318.12k £370.93k £384.33k £617.53k
Total expenditure £222.44k £246.05k £354.36k £349.42k £320.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £86.30k £169.26k £39.07k £30.79k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.37k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £391.75k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £218.55k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £859
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £157.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £163.10k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0