Financial history Friends of Hoddesdon Town Football Club

Charity number: 1139408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £10.07k £19.73k £5.66k £10.20k £13.26k
Total expenditure £12.70k £19.00k £7.23k £9.72k £6.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A