DIABETES CARE TRUST (ABCD) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE AND ENCOURAGE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ALL MEDICAL AND OTHER HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS INVOLVED WITH THE CARE OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM DIABETES, TO ADVANCE THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO DIABETES MELLITUS AND DIABETES CARE. THESE ACTIVITIES ARE INTENDED TO IMPROVE THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH DIABETES AND AVOID COMPLICATIONS OF THE CONDITION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Kate Fayers | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hermione Price | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vijay Jayagopal | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Sanders | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dinesh Nagi | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rowan Hillson | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr KETAN DHATARIYA | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP NORTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr PETER WINOCOUR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £353.85k | £236.68k | £219.90k | £296.90k | £466.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.03k | £158.38k | £183.29k | £292.80k | £220.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 04 January 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 04 January 2023 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 MAY 2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 APR 2016 as amended on 15 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE AND ENCOURAGE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ALL MEDICAL AND OTHER HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS INVOLVED WITH THE CARE OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM DIABETES; TO ADVANCE THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO DIABETES MELLITUS AND DIABETES CARE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
483 GREEN LANES
LONDON
N13 4BS
- Phone:
- 01461 600542
- Email:
- tricia@redhotirons.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window