Financial history NEEDS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1139667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £69.69k £86.11k £83.44k £131.71k £200.81k
Total expenditure £66.84k £88.59k £85.41k £141.56k £157.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A