Accounts and annual returns GURNARD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1139069
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 16 September 2024 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 16 September 2024 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 17 August 2022 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 17 August 2022 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 August 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 13 August 2020 14 days late Download Open in new window