Financial history GURNARD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1139069
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £148.70k £190.77k £227.32k £201.14k £255.00k
Total expenditure £166.07k £196.78k £248.85k £255.79k £291.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £120.17k £189.11k £135.85k £122.00k