Busy Bees Ledbury

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Busy Bees is run by a voluntary parent committee and we are a member of the Pre-School Learning Alliance. Busy Bees runs Preschool sessions for children aged 2-5 and a Breakfast and After School Club for children aged 3-11 years. Busy Bees is open Monday to Friday, term time only. The business currently runs from a rented purpose built portacabin in the grounds of Ledbury Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 17 November 2010: Standard registration
- 27 March 2012: Funds received from 1040458 BUSY BEES @ LPS
- BUSY BEES @ LPS (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Davies | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Armstrong | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Madelyn Alice Cooper | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Louise Chesham | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lovering | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.67k | £165.88k | £130.96k | £124.00k | £121.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.04k | £166.44k | £162.54k | £152.00k | £135.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
17 July 2023 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2023 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2023 | 320 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 November 2022 | 505 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 November 2022 | 505 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JUNE 2010 as amended on 25 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY:- 1) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION MEANS OR ABILITY; 2) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; 3) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LEDBURY, HEREFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hive
Bye Street
LEDBURY
HR8 2AG
- Phone:
- 01531248087
- Email:
- admin@busybeesledbury.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window