Financial history LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL SOUTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1139080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £299.64k £320.70k £341.80k £379.46k £436.12k
Total expenditure £320.01k £317.82k £324.63k £409.19k £391.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £344.98k N/A
Income from government grants £256.51k £296.47k £305.24k N/A £401.05k