WINTON HOUSE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing - a centre for the refreshment of the public, an information desk, a contact point for booking volunteer-provided transport for people in need, help and support to local voluntary groups and charities by - making available meeting rooms & an office desk, hiring equipment, photocopying and encapsulating facilities, and postbox facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Richard Peter Phillips CMG | Chair | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael WADDINGTON | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Grayson KIDD | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Christopher BROWN | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda HATHAWAY | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jeanette Crawford | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Anne WINTER | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ronald Golding | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER CHRISTINE TICKNER | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.67k | £84.25k | £97.13k | £101.06k | £254.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.13k | £214.61k | £133.85k | £105.72k | £173.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/04/2014
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE INDIVIDUALS AND (2) THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE "THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR" MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED EXCLUSIVELY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND "VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS" MEANS INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION, BUT DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINTON HOUSE CENTRE
WINTON HOUSE
18 HIGH STREET
PETERSFIELD
GU32 3JL
- Phone:
- 01730266046
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window