LONGTHWAITE ROAD PRE SCHOOL LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of Longthwaite Road Pre School is to provide nursey education for children in the Wigton area between the ages of 2 and 4 years old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Total income includes £89,766 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 03 December 2010: Standard registration
- 16 March 2011: Funds received from 1048014 LONGTHWAITE ROAD PRE-SCHOOL
- 22 March 2021: Funds transferred to 1053671 FRIENDS OF ST CUTHBERTS SCHOOL
- 22 March 2021: Funds transferred to 1031266 Friends of Wigton Infant School
- 22 March 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.81k | £82.11k | £98.47k | £98.40k | £98.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.30k | £64.67k | £92.24k | £86.12k | £223.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £45.91k | £65.53k | £87.06k | £84.83k | £89.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 September 2020 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 September 2020 | 71 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 17 July 2019 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 17 July 2019 | 17 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 10 July 2018 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2017
(These accounts |
10 July 2018 | 10 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/10/2010
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY:- 4.1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; 4.2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; 4.3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE ALLERDALE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window