Trustees SWINDON BATS SPORTS & SOCIAL CLUB

Charity number: 1140531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cheryl Ann Bateman Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Andrea Vigor Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Alison Isabelle Fulton Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Maia McAdam Trustee 26 February 2024
None on record
Rebecca Sophie Harrison Trustee 02 January 2024
None on record
ANDREW JAMES LAWRENCE COOPER Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record
SUSAN PAULINE MEAD Trustee 23 May 2016
None on record
RICHARD CARVER Trustee
None on record