GREEN TREE CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Distribution of funds to support advancement of the Orthodox Jewish faith and education and relief of poverty and sickness in any part of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
- Hackney
- Israel
- United States
Governance
- 03 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Greenbaum | Trustee | 14 January 2015 |
|
|||||
DAVID GREENBAUM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £660 | £562 | £4.43k | £795 | £598 | |
|
Total expenditure | £480 | £504 | £6.41k | £36.58k | £3.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL AND DEED OF VARIATION 11 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL THEREOF AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AND FOR SUCH OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE TRUSTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, NAMELY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND INFIRMITY IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, AND D) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE AND MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Catherine Road
MANCHESTER
M8 4HA
- Phone:
- 01617404780
- Email:
- r.greenbaum1@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window