TENNIS LEICESTERSHIRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the education and physical training of people under the age of 19 by awarding grants to enable them to receive coaching in the sport of tennis and entry into tennis competitions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 08 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY JARVIS | Chair | 08 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Linsey Ann Richmond | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY ROY BONE | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £2.50k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £5.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.80k | £2.35k | £2.06k | £3.85k | £5.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15/12/2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 19 YEARS IN LEICESTERSHIRE BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO RECEIVE COACHING IN THE SPORT OF TENNIS AND ENTRY INTO TENNIS COMPETITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Hardwick Drive
Shangton
LEICESTER
LE8 0PS
- Phone:
- 01858 437719
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window