GADDESDEN PLACE RDA CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides horse riding facilities and instruction for children and adults with a wide range of disabilities in the area around Hemel Hempstaed in Hertfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 10 February 2011: Standard registration
- 02 May 2012: Funds received from 1074313 GADDESDEN PLACE GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSO...
No other names
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH REID | Chair | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Bradbury | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER PETER GRANT | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Matthew Parker | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROL BAXTER | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Yvonne Fagg | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANN LOUISE SMILES | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.01k | £279.57k | £85.37k | £110.92k | £140.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.01k | £92.50k | £100.53k | £124.87k | £166.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.97k | £225 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/09/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATION CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE HERTFORDSHIRE AREA.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gaddesden Place RDA
Bridens Camp
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Hertfordshire
HP2 6EY
- Phone:
- 08452415309
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window