RASE HERITAGE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserving the heritage of Market Rasen and surrounding area through collecting artefacts and displaying them in various locations. By collecting personal memories, publishing various leaflets promoting the heritage of the area and by arranging open meeetings with presentations based on local heritage/history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 20 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rita Dianne Clark Tuckett | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Ann Patrica Lillywhite | Trustee | 03 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MALDWYN JONES | Trustee | 20 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.46k | £619 | £267 | £276 | £93 | |
|
Total expenditure | £683 | £1.99k | £220 | £190 | £143 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ADOPTED 09/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2011
Charitable objects
“THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF THE RASE DISTRICT OF LINCOLNSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE CREATION AND OPERATION OF A HERITAGE CENTRE, INCLUDING THE FORMATION AND PRESERVATION OF A MUSEUM COLLECTION ABOUT THE AREA AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROMOTION OF ALL ASPECTS OF HERITAGE IN THE AREA.”
Area of benefit
LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stepping Stones
Low Church Road
Middle Rasen
MARKET RASEN
Lincolnshire
LN8 3TY
- Phone:
- 07876614824
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window