FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND NORTHERN DIOCESAN SYNOD

Charity Number: 1141769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of the Christian faith by supporting the Churches of the Northern Diocese of the Free Church of England in worship and witness; by planting new Churches; and by activities supportive of these aims.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £7,497
Total expenditure: £9,163

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 May 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Rosemary Beavan Trustee 23 March 2024
HOLY TRINITY FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Received: On time
Beverly Wood Trustee 23 March 2024
None on record
Rev Anthony Gerard Ford MBE Trustee 07 October 2023
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: On time
Julie Anne Murphy Trustee 25 March 2023
None on record
NORMA CLARKSON BED PGCE Trustee 25 March 2023
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: On time
ST GEORGE'S FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, BLACKBURN
Received: On time
MARLENE PARKER Trustee 25 March 2023
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: On time
ST GEORGE'S FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, BLACKBURN
Received: On time
Rev Matthew Paul Firth MA BTh Trustee 25 March 2023
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CENTRAL TRUST
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Karim Akbari Ghalehnovi Trustee 05 March 2023
None on record
Dr Mohammed Shirvani Trustee 05 March 2023
ST ABDIAS OF SUSA CHURCH
Recently registered
Samuel Bennet King Trustee 05 March 2023
None on record
RIGHT REVD DR JOHN ROBERT KIPLING FENWICK DD Trustee 04 May 2011
ST JOHN'S CHURCH, TOTTINGTON
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.60k £11.06k £10.55k £25.96k £7.50k
Total expenditure £9.02k £6.30k £4.03k £10.39k £9.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 13 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 April 2025 164 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
16 WINDSOR CRESCENT
ULVERSTON
LA12 9NP
Phone:
01229584997
Email:
No information available