Financial history BIRMINGHAM COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT COMPLEX

Charity number: 1142572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £22.68k £23.49k £24.08k £23.83k £23.45k
Total expenditure £22.34k £22.89k £23.93k £24.19k £23.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.90k N/A N/A