Charity overview BEQUEST OF CHARLES CECIL MARSHALL TO THE MISSION TO THE DEAF AND DUMB (NORTHANTS AND RUTLAND)
Charity number: 208164-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME HIGH COURT SCHEME 17/12/1936
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/01/2012
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION CONCURRED WITH ON 12/07/2012
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN OR TOWARDS THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE MISSION TO THE DEAF AND DUMB (NORTHANTS AND RUTLAND)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 02 November 1964: Standard registration
- 18 September 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.