Register of Charities - The Charity Commission TRUST PROPERTY ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH DISABLED PEOPLE'S CLUB AND BRITISH RED CROSS SOCIETY
Charity number: 208568-1
Removed charity
Governing document
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 28TH MAY 1960 AND SCHEMES OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF 12TH FEBRUARY 1963 AND 9TH MAY 1990 AS ALTERED OR AFFECTED BY SCHEME DATED 3RD SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
ANY PURPOSES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE WORK OF THE BRITISH RED CROSS SOCIETY IN EAST DEREHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF DISABLED PERSONS RESIDENT IN EAST DEREHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
EAST DEREHAM
Registration history
- 16 July 1965: Standard registration
- 06 July 1999: Removed (Duplicate registration)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.