Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THOMAS ELBRIDGE
Charity number: 201015-9
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 3 DECEMBER 1880 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 10 MAY 1962 AND 7 MARCH 1974
Charitable objects
(A) PAYMENT TO THE VICAR (B) PAYMENT TO THE INCUMBENT (C) PAYMENT TO THE PARISH CLERK (D) PAYMENT TO THE BELL-RINGERS (E) FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WESTBURY-UPON-TRYM
Registration history
- 13 March 1962: Standard registration
- 12 October 2005: Removed
- 12 October 2005: Funds transferred to 1109141-32 THE CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES OF THE PARISH OF WESTBU...
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.