Register of Charities - The Charity Commission JOAN STAINER

Charity number: 201015-32
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 03/12/1880 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 10/05/1962 AND 07/03/1974
Charitable objects
A)PAYMENT TO THE VICAR B)PAYMENT TO THE INCUMBENT C)PAYMENT TO THE PARISH CLERK D)PAYMENT TO THE BELL-RINGERS E)FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WESTBURY-UPON-TRYM
Registration history
  • 04 March 1992: Standard registration
  • 14 October 2005: Removed
  • 14 October 2005: Funds transferred to 1109141-32 THE CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES OF THE PARISH OF WESTBU...
Other names

No other names